What method do you use? What method works for you? Mum’s? Dad’s? Last year’s teacher? Mr. Khan’s? Jack’s? Which? It doesn’t matter which one, as long as it works for you.

14 thoughts on “So how do you multiply?”

So everyone – take a 2 digit by 2 digit example and explain HOW you would answer it. For example, how would I answer 65 X 91. Well, I might use the matrix method or Jack’s method. I know that 60 x 90 is 5400. And 60 x 1 is of course 60. Plus 5 x 90 = 450 and 5 ones are of course 5. So – add together 5400 + 450 + 60 + 5 = 5915. Is that right? I hope so.

Now what about you? What would you do with your multiplication problem? Please explain in a comment box below.

I like to multiply by the old way for example if you get 2 digit and if the top 2 digit was 87 and the bottom 2 digit was 25 you can do 2000+100+70+5=2175

87
25x
4 3 5
174
2175

My Multiplication method is the old fashion way, cause it easier to me . For example 47×23. You take 3×7= 21 you carry 2 then you go to 3×4=12+2=14.Next you go to 2×7=14 you carry 1, then you take 2×4=8+1=9.Then you add all of them together= 1081.

My 2 digit number would be, 10×16 well 10×10= 100 and then add 60 so 160. Another one would be to take 15×16,

again 10×10= 100 10×5=50 10×6=60 so the answer would be 240.

So if it’s 35×20 you have to multiply 0x5=0 and next 0x3=0. Next is 2×5=10 then 2×3+1=7, 7+0+0=700.
_35
x20
—–-
_00
70
—–
700

That was a nice easy one wasn’t it! If I did 35 x 27 I would have had to do another calculation – 7 x 35 and add it to my answer. Well 7 x 30 = 210 + 7 x 5 = 35… so 210 + 35 = 245….. plus the 700 = 945

If I wanted to do 30 X 19 I would do 30 X 10 which is 300 then 9 X 30 which is 270 and then add them both together and that is 520 which is the answer to the question 30 X 19

If I was multiplying 53 and 37 together I would start by multiplying 7 and 3 and then multiply 7 and 50 and I would add the answer up together. The answer should be 371. Then I would multiply 30 and 3 and then multiply 30 and 50 and again I would add and the answers together and the answer should be 1590. Finally I would add 371 and 1590 and the answer is 1961 and that’s the answer of 53 x 37

multiply by the old fashion way because it is easy to me.
So I will use 10 x 12 = 0 x 2=0 then 2 x 1=2 then 0 x 1=0 then 1 x 1=1
20+10 like
20
+10 then it will be 120

So if you want to do 56 x 42 first do 56 x 2. Then you multiply 6 and 2 and that = 12 but you subtract 10 and you make it a reminder for 50. Then you do 50 x 2 and that = 100 and then add 110 so 56×2 = 112. Next do 56 x 40 so add zero from 40 to the bottom and then do 40 x 6.
That = 240 so take 2 and make it to a remainder then do 5 x 4 and that = 20. Add 2 to 20
then it = to 22 so its 2240. After doing that do 2240 + 112 and that = 2352 so this is
the answer

So I would like to multiply 43 times 3. So….

First you have to times the 4 by the three or 3. Which is actually saying 40 times 3 isn’t it!! And that is like saying 4 x 3 = 12 but you have to add another zero because it’s not the number 4 it’s actually 40.

Then you have to do 3 x 3 and it is 9 40 x 3 is 120 so you just have to add the 9 and the 120 so the answer is 129.

I like multiplying by the well known old style technique. First to do 75 x 30 you have to multiply 5 and 0 which is 0 and multiply 7 and 0 which is zero so you have 00 at the bottom. Next you have to leave a space below the first zero. ^ than multiply 3 and 5 and 7 and 3 add up the numbers below and you are done. Thank you for reading.

For example, 94 x 32.
First, you have to multiply the 4, by 2 which is 8. Next, you multiply the 4 by 3 which is 12, but since the 3 is actually 30, so it would be 120. Then you multiply the 9 by 2 which is 18 but since the 9 is actually 90, it would be 180. Then, you multiply the 9, by 3 and the 9 and 3 is from the tens place, it would be 270. Lastly, you add them all. 8+120+180+2700=3008. The answer is 3008.

The question is 32 times 21 so you do 1*32=32 2*32=64 the 2 by the 21 is actually 20 so I have to put another 0 to the 64 so it is 640+32=672

So everyone – take a 2 digit by 2 digit example and explain HOW you would answer it. For example, how would I answer 65 X 91. Well, I might use the matrix method or Jack’s method. I know that 60 x 90 is 5400. And 60 x 1 is of course 60. Plus 5 x 90 = 450 and 5 ones are of course 5. So – add together 5400 + 450 + 60 + 5 = 5915. Is that right? I hope so.

Now what about you? What would you do with your multiplication problem? Please explain in a comment box below.

I like to multiply by the old way for example if you get 2 digit and if the top 2 digit was 87 and the bottom 2 digit was 25 you can do 2000+100+70+5=2175

87

25x

4 3 5

174

2175

My Multiplication method is the old fashion way, cause it easier to me . For example 47×23. You take 3×7= 21 you carry 2 then you go to 3×4=12+2=14.Next you go to 2×7=14 you carry 1, then you take 2×4=8+1=9.Then you add all of them together= 1081.

My 2 digit number would be, 10×16 well 10×10= 100 and then add 60 so 160. Another one would be to take 15×16,

again 10×10= 100 10×5=50 10×6=60 so the answer would be 240.

So if it’s 35×20 you have to multiply 0x5=0 and next 0x3=0. Next is 2×5=10 then 2×3+1=7, 7+0+0=700.

_35

x20

—–-

_00

70

—–

700

That was a nice easy one wasn’t it! If I did 35 x 27 I would have had to do another calculation – 7 x 35 and add it to my answer. Well 7 x 30 = 210 + 7 x 5 = 35… so 210 + 35 = 245….. plus the 700 = 945

If I wanted to do 30 X 19 I would do 30 X 10 which is 300 then 9 X 30 which is 270 and then add them both together and that is 520 which is the answer to the question 30 X 19

If I was multiplying 53 and 37 together I would start by multiplying 7 and 3 and then multiply 7 and 50 and I would add the answer up together. The answer should be 371. Then I would multiply 30 and 3 and then multiply 30 and 50 and again I would add and the answers together and the answer should be 1590. Finally I would add 371 and 1590 and the answer is 1961 and that’s the answer of 53 x 37

multiply by the old fashion way because it is easy to me.

So I will use 10 x 12 = 0 x 2=0 then 2 x 1=2 then 0 x 1=0 then 1 x 1=1

20+10 like

20

+10 then it will be 120

So if you want to do 56 x 42 first do 56 x 2. Then you multiply 6 and 2 and that = 12 but you subtract 10 and you make it a reminder for 50. Then you do 50 x 2 and that = 100 and then add 110 so 56×2 = 112. Next do 56 x 40 so add zero from 40 to the bottom and then do 40 x 6.

That = 240 so take 2 and make it to a remainder then do 5 x 4 and that = 20. Add 2 to 20

then it = to 22 so its 2240. After doing that do 2240 + 112 and that = 2352 so this is

the answer

So I would like to multiply 43 times 3. So….

First you have to times the 4 by the three or 3. Which is actually saying 40 times 3 isn’t it!! And that is like saying 4 x 3 = 12 but you have to add another zero because it’s not the number 4 it’s actually 40.

Then you have to do 3 x 3 and it is 9 40 x 3 is 120 so you just have to add the 9 and the 120 so the answer is 129.

I like multiplying by the well known old style technique. First to do 75 x 30 you have to multiply 5 and 0 which is 0 and multiply 7 and 0 which is zero so you have 00 at the bottom. Next you have to leave a space below the first zero. ^ than multiply 3 and 5 and 7 and 3 add up the numbers below and you are done. Thank you for reading.

For example, 94 x 32.

First, you have to multiply the 4, by 2 which is 8. Next, you multiply the 4 by 3 which is 12, but since the 3 is actually 30, so it would be 120. Then you multiply the 9 by 2 which is 18 but since the 9 is actually 90, it would be 180. Then, you multiply the 9, by 3 and the 9 and 3 is from the tens place, it would be 270. Lastly, you add them all. 8+120+180+2700=3008. The answer is 3008.

The question is 32 times 21 so you do 1*32=32 2*32=64 the 2 by the 21 is actually 20 so I have to put another 0 to the 64 so it is 640+32=672